CA SCR26 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Equal Pay Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Pay Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Assembly - SCR 26 Jackson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR26 Jackson et al (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2019.
2019-04-17SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2019-04-11SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1192.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-08AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8).
2019-04-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-28AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-03-28SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 474.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-03-14SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback