CA SCR23 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Wines: Down to Earth Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Wines: Down to Earth Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Assembly - SCR 23 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR23 McGuire et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2019.
2019-05-02SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2019-04-25SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-04-25AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1363.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 22).
2019-04-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-04-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-04-08SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 591.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-03-20SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback