CA SCR21 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Costa Mesa Fire Captain Michael Kreza Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Costa Mesa Fire Captain Michael Kreza Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR21 Bates et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SCR 21 Bates Senate Third Reading By Brough (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR21 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-03SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-03SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2019-08-26SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2266.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-08-22SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-08-22AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2805.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-08-14AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
2019-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-02AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-06-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2019-05-09SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1005.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-24SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 806.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-03-07SenateRe-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback