CA SCR16 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-20)
Status: Passed on March 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-08 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 399.) Ordered to the Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Women in Construction Week.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Women in Construction Week.

Sponsors

Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]
Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]
Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]
Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Assembly - SCR 16 Caballero Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR16 Caballero et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-08SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 399.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-04-21 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 20, Statutes of 2021.
2021-04-21 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2021-03-25SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-03-25AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 794.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-03-25AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-18AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 18).
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2021-03-08SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-03-03SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback