CA SCR152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Native Hawaiian and Pacific Islander community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Native Hawaiian and Pacific Islander community.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Assembly - SCR 152 Lara Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR152 Lara et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-12SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-12SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2018-07-05SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2).
2018-06-28AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-06-21SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4824.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-06-20SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-11SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback