CA SCR146 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-28)
Status: Passed on August 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Grown Flower Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Grown Flower Month.

Sponsors

Sen. Mike McGuire [D]Asm. Dante Acosta [R]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Travis Allen [R]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Sen. Toni Atkins [D]Asm. Catharine Baker [R]Sen. Patricia Bates [R]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Sen. Tom Berryhill [R]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. William Brough [R]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Anna Caballero [D]
Asm. Ian Calderon [D]Sen. Anthony Cannella [R]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Rocky Chavez [R]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Kansen Chu [D]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Brian Dahle [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Asm. Susan Eggman [D]
Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]
Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Sen. Steve Glazer [D]Asm. Todd Gloria [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Matthew Harper [R]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Sen. Connie Leyva [D]Asm. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [R]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [R]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Jose Medina [D]Sen. Holly Mitchell [D]Sen. William Monning [D]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Sen. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]
Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Sen. Anthony Portantino [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]
Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Sen. Nancy Skinner [D]
Asm. Marc Steinorth [R]Sen. Henry Stern [D]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Tony Thurmond [D]
Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Shirley Weber [D]
Sen. Scott Wilk [R]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR146 McGuire et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2018.
2018-08-09SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2018-08-07SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-06AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Page 6147.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-06AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-06-11SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4536.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-30SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-17SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback