CA SCR145 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Juneteenth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juneteenth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Assembly - SCR 145 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR145 Bradford (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 112, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-27SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
2018-06-21SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-06-21AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5933.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-18AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-06-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-06-11SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4535.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-15SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback