CA SCR144 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to National Military Appreciation Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Military Appreciation Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Assembly - SCR 144 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR144 Fuller et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 102, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-21SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m.
2018-06-18SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-06-14AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5822.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11).
2018-06-11AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-05-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-05-25SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4261.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback