CA SCR12 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Reverend Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr.
Title
Dr. Martin Luther King, Jr. Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Assembly - SCR 12 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR12 Bradford et al (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR12 Bradford et al (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 12, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-03-14 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2023-03-06 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 524.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (February 23). |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-01-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 61.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |