CA SCR115 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 242, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the opioid crisis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid crisis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SCR 115 McGuire Senate Third Reading By ARAMBULA (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR115 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR115 McGuire et al (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 242, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6150.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-06-27AssemblyJune 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-04-26SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4832.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-21SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback