CA SCR11 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-21-1)
Status: Passed on September 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Cancer Patients’ Bill of Rights.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cancer Patients’ Bill of Rights.

Sponsors

Sen. Susan Rubio [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]
Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Sen. Bob Archuleta [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]
Sen. Josh Becker [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]
Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]Asm. Isaac Bryan [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]
Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]
Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]
Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]
Sen. Bill Dodd [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]
Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Sen. Benjamin Hueso [D]
Sen. Brian Jones [R]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]
Asm. Tom Lackey [R]Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Sen. Monique Limon [D]
Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]
Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]
Sen. Josh Newman [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R]
Sen. Richard Pan [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Sen. Anthony Portantino [D]
Asm. Bill Quirk [D]Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]
Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]
Asm. Chris Ward [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]Sen. Scott Wilk [R]

Roll Calls

2021-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR11 Rubio et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR11 Rubio et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-10 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2021-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2235.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-08-23SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-08-19AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Page 2435.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-08-19AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-07-14AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 13).
2021-06-29AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-05-20AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2021-04-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2021-04-08SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 714.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-02-17Senate(Corrected March 19).
2021-02-17SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-02-04SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback