CA SCR109 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-16-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 117, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-16-1)
Status: Passed on August 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 117, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Juneteenth.
Title
Juneteenth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SCR 109 Bradford Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR109 Bradford et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR109 Bradford et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 117, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-19 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m. | |
2022-08-08 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5758.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2022-06-16 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4264.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |