CA SCR104 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-18-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 50-18-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Compost Awareness Week.
Title
Compost Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-19 - Assembly - SCR 104 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR104 Limón (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR104 Limón (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-05-27 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2022-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4744.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 12). |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3582.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |