CA SCA20 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 25.5 of Article XIII thereof, relating to taxation.
Title
Local sales taxes: online sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Senate | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Set for hearing August 16. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | May 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 5061.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4812.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | April 18 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E. & C.A., and APPR. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 22. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |