CA SCA18 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - May 25 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 25 in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 15 of Article II thereof, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: recalls.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24SenateMay 25 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-17SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-08SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2018-04-24SenateMay 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-17SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2018-03-15SenateReferred to Com. on E. & C.A.
2018-03-07SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after April 6.
2018-03-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback