CA SCA14 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 8 of, and by adding Section 7.3 to, Article IV thereof, relating to the Legislature.
Title
Legislative procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA14 Wolk (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Be adopted and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA14 Wolk (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | Died on the inactive file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (June 22). |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 5405.) |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 4378.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4265.) (June 13). |
2016-06-13 | Senate | Motion to place on APPR. suspense file failed. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 4265.) (June 13) |
2016-06-10 | Senate | Set for hearing June 13. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4235.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Set for hearing June 8. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after May 22. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |