CA SBX26 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6404.5 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Smoking in the workplace.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-08-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB6 Monning (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 48.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended. |
2015-08-21 | Senate | Set for hearing August 24. |
2015-08-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 28.) (August 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-13 | Senate | Set for hearing August 19. |
2015-07-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on P.H. & D.S. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 6404.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |