CA SBX211 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2009-10 Second Extraordinary Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 68220, 68221, and 68222 to the Government Code, relating to judges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Judges: employment benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-02-15 - Assembly - SB 11 Steinberg Senate Third Reading By LIEU Second Extraordinary Session (Y: 69 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB11 Ducheny (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2009-10 Second Extraordinary Session.
2009-02-20 Approved by Governor.
2009-02-19 Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
2009-02-15 In Senate. To enrollment.
2009-02-15 In Assembly. Read first time. Art. IV, Sec. 8(b), of Constitution dispensed with. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 54.) Read second time. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 3. Page 56.) To Senate.
2009-02-14 Senate Rule 29.3 suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 28.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 42.) Placed on third reading. Read third time. Amended. (Page 29.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 32.) To Assembly.
2009-02-12 Withdrawn from committee. Read second time. Placed on third reading.
2009-02-11 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS.

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sbx2_11&sess=0910&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sbx2_11_bill_20090211_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sbx2_11_bill_20090214_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sbx2_11_bill_20090215_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sbx2_11_bill_20090220_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sbx2_11_vote_20090214_000001_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sbx2_11_vote_20090214_1015PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/09-10/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sbx2_11_vote_20090215_0148AM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments 750

feedback