CA SBX11 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13975, 14500, 14526.5, and 16965 of, to add Sections 14033, 14526.7, and 16321 to, to add Part 5.1 (commencing with Section 14460) to Division 3 of Title 2 of, and to repeal Section 14534.1 of, the Government Code, to amend Section 39719 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 21080.37 of, and to add Division 13.6 (commencing with Section 21200) to, the Public Resources Code, to amend Section 99312.1 of the Public Utilities Code, to amend Sections 6051.8, 6201.8, 7360, 8352.4, 8352.5, 8352.6, and 60050 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, to amend Sections 183.1, 820.1, 2192, 2192.1, and 2192.2 of, to add Sections 2103.1 and 2192.4 to, and to add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 2030) to Division 3 of, the Streets and Highways Code, and to add Sections 9250.3, 9250.6, and 9400.5 to the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Transportation funding.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Jim Frazier [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Isadore Hall [D] |
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Tony Mendoza [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-08-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-08-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 36.) (August 19). |
2015-08-06 | Senate | Set for hearing August 19. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & I.D. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & I.D. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | From printer. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. Referred to Com. on RLS. To print. |