CA SB999 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-07 - Referred to Com. on B. & P.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Hearing: Jun 26 @ 9:00 am Assembly Business And Professions Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 7316 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Barbering and cosmetology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB999 Morrell et al (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 2.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-03SenateMay 7 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4696.) (April 16).
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code7316Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback