CA SB998 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 116900) to Part 12 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discontinuation of residential water service: urban and community water systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB998 Dodd (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-15AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 15).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4335.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-10SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4814.) (April 24).
2018-04-23SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4719.) (April 18).
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 4514.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C., EQ., and JUD.
2018-02-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback