CA SB998 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - Set for hearing April 3.
Pending: Senate Energy, Utilities and Communications Committee
Hearing: Apr 3 @ 9:00 am in Room 3191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


An act to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 116900) to Part 12 of Division 104 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 777, 779, 779.1, 780, 10009, 10010, 10010.1, 12822, 12823, 12823.1, 16481, 16482, and 16482.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Water shutoffs: urban and community water systems.



2018-03-12SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C., EQ., and JUD.
2018-02-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

California State Sources

Bill Comments