CA SB994 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 98.11 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employees: leave provisions: database.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code98.11New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code273.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback