CA SB989 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 461, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 461, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 384 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to highways.
Title
State highways: Route 84: relinquishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 989 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By QUIRK (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB989 Wieckowski (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB989 Wieckowski (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 461, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6590.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4876.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4769.) (April 23). |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4606.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-02-06 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 384 | Amended Code | Citation Text |