CA SB988 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 242, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 242, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1649.1, 1649.2, 1649.4, and 1649.5 of, and to repeal and add Section 1649.3 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care facilities.
Title
Compassionate Access to Medical Cannabis Act or Ryan’s Law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB988 Hueso Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SB 988 Hueso Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB988 Hueso (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-04 - Assembly - SB 988 Hueso Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB988 Hueso (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 242, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4850.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5756.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-08 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3641.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3273.) (March 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1649.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1649.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1649.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1649.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1649.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |