CA SB986 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 21453, 21971, and 42001.15 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: right turn violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB986 Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB986 Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | June 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4040.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4001.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3336.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H., PUB. S., and APPR. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21453 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21971 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 42001.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |