CA SB984 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 11142 to the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State boards and commissions: representation: appointments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB984 Skinner (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyAugust 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 28).
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-06-21AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and JUD.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4382.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4301.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4814.) (April 24).
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-12SenateApril 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 4604.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
2018-02-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8.
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code11142New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback