CA SB981 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-08 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-08 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4041, 4045, 4055, 5260, 5310, and 5320 of, to amend, add, and repeal Section 4040 of, and to add Section 4801 to, the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: document delivery.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 4040 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 4041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 4045 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 4055 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5260 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 5320 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB981 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB981 |