CA SB98 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 759, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 409.7 to the Penal Code, relating to public safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public peace: media access.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 98 McGuire Senate Third Reading By Wicks (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB98 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB98 McGuire et al (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 759, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-09 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-17 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2021-09-10SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 5. Page 2626.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 18. Page 3131.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-09-03AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-09-03AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2021-08-31AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-30AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
2021-08-19AssemblyAugust 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-07-14AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 1328.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1182.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-03-22SenateMarch 22 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-03-12SenateSet for hearing March 22.
2021-03-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 423.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-02-17SenateSet for hearing March 9.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2021-01-11SenateRead first time.
2020-12-23SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 22.
2020-12-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code409.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB98
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB98#99INT
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB98#98AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB98#97AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB98#96AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB98#95AMD
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB98#94ENR
Texthttps://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB98#93CHP
Roll Callhttp://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billVotesClient.xhtml?bill_id=202120220SB98

Bill Comments

feedback