CA SB979 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - May 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 9 (commencing with Section 540) to Title 13 of Part 1 of the Penal Code, relating to property crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property crimes: unlawful entry onto property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-20 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [05-20-2020]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-21SenateMay 20 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5.) Reconsideration granted.
2020-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2020-03-18SenateMarch 24 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-03-10SenateSet for hearing March 24.
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2020-02-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13.
2020-02-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code540New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback