CA SB974 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14007.8 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal: immigration status: adults.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB974 Lara et al (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB974 Lara et al (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 4422.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4301.) (May 25). |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4556.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2018-02-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14007.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |