CA SB973 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 23320.5 and 25600 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages: annual license fees: surcharge: distilled spirits manufacturers: free or discounted rides.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB973 Dodd et al (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-26AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-23SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 4759.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-09SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4366.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-02-22SenateSet for hearing March 13.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-02-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code23320.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code25600Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback