CA SB972 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 460, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the heading of Article 2.5 (commencing with Section 215) of Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, and to add Section 215.5 to, the Education Code, relating to pupil and student health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pupil and student health: identification cards: suicide prevention hotline telephone numbers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB972 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 972 Portantino Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB972 Portantino et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 460, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-17 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-24SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-20SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5423.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6310.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-07-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 13).
2018-05-15AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-05-03AssemblyReferred to Coms. on ED. and APPR.
2018-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4837.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-12SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-12SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-03-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-03-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4375.) (March 14).
2018-03-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-27SenateSet for hearing March 14.
2018-02-14SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-02-02SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 4.
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code215Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code215.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code216New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback