CA SB964 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 731, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 731, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 7510.5 of the Government Code, relating to public retirement systems.
Title
Public Employees’ Retirement Fund and Teachers’ Retirement Fund: investments: climate-related financial risk.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Sen. William Monning [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] |
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Asm. Tony Thurmond [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 964 Allen Senate Third Reading By KALRA (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB964 Allen (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB964 Allen (Y: 27 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 731, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 6962.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 4346.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4300.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | April 16 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 4605.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7510.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 84602.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |