CA SB964 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 573, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 573, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1367.03 of, to add Section 1367.035 to, and to repeal and add Section 1380.3 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 14456 of, and to add Section 14456.3 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB964 Hernandez Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 964 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB964 Hernandez (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 964 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 54 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB964 Hernandez (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 573, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4915.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 6494.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6343.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (August 14). |
2014-08-06 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (June 24). |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 10. Page 3597.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3706.) (May 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-09 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3342.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2014-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 13. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1367.035 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1380.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1380.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1380.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1380.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1380.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14087.95 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14456 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14456.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |