CA SB963 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 351, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 351, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 60292 and 60315 of, and to repeal Sections 60290, 60291, and 60328.1 of, the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water replenishment districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB963 Allen Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 963 Allen Senate Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB963 Allen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 963 Allen Senate Third Reading By MURATSUCHI (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB963 Allen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 351, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5422.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6299.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4875.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4623.) (April 11). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 73 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 60290 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 60291 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 60292 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 60315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 60328.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |