CA SB961 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 559, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 53398.69 of, and to add Sections 53398.75.7 and 65040.15 to, the Government Code, relating to local government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhanced infrastructure financing districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB961 Allen et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 961 Allen Senate Third Reading By GABRIEL (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Housing and Community Development] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB961 Allen (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 559, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-19 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 6135.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 6961.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4346.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4300.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-08SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
2018-05-07SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-03SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4904.) (May 1).
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4810.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-17SenateApril 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H.
2018-04-02SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-02SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and EQ.
2018-02-01SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 3.
2018-01-31SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code53398.69Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code53398.75.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code65040.15New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8574.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback