CA SB960 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 825, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 825, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1031 of, and to repeal Section 1031.5 of, the Government Code, and to repeal Section 2267 of the Vehicle Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Public employment: peace officers: citizenship.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] | Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] | Sen. Susan Rubio [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-18 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB960 Skinner et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-15 - Assembly - SB 960 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Cervantes (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB960 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-15 - Assembly - SB 960 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Cervantes (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB960 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 825, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4898.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 19. Page 5887.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 22). |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 3553.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3183.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 22. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 1031 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 1031.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 2267 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |