CA SB96 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 41017, 41031, 41032, 41040, 41051, 41053, 41055, 41056, 41075, 41100, 41129, 41130, 41135, 41136, 41137, 41140, and 41150 of, to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 41030) of Chapter 2 of Part 20 of Division 2 of, to amend and repeal Section 41025 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 41007, 41009, 41016.5, 41020, and 41046 of, to add Sections 41007.1, 41007.2, 41007.3, 41007.4, 41007.5, and 41028 to, to repeal Section 41033 of, and to repeal and add Sections 41004 and 41030 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency Telephone Users Surcharge Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB96 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 96 B. & F. R. Third Reading Urgency By TING (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB96 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 54, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-01 Approved by the Governor.
2019-06-27SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-06-20SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1670.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-20SenateUrgency clause adopted.
2019-06-17SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-06-17AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 14. Page 2309.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-17AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.)
2019-06-17AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-17AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 670.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41007New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41009New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41016.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41017Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41020New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41025Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41031Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41032Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41040Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41046New CodeSee Bill Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41051Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41053Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41055Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41056Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41075Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41100Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41129Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41130Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41135Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41136Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41137Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41140Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code41150Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback