CA SB958 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-28 - June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6.15 (commencing with Section 1385.010) to Chapter 2.2 of Division 2 of the Health and Safety Code, and to add Article 1.6 (commencing with Section 10128.5) to Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 2 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Medication and Patient Safety Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB958 Limón et al (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 3904.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3777.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3349.) (April 6). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1385.010 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10128.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |