CA SB958 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 66025.9, 79220, 79222, and 79225 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: support services for foster youth: Cooperating Agencies Foster Youth Educational Support Program.
Sponsors
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on HUMAN S. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2020-02-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66025.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 79220 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 79222 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 79225 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB958 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB958 |