CA SB958 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 604, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 604, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 50079.6 to the Government Code, relating to school districts.
Title
Davis Joint Unified School District: special taxes: exemptions: teachers and district employees.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB958 Dodd Concurrence (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 958 Dodd Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 41 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 958 Dodd Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 37 N: 31 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB958 Dodd (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-30 - Assembly - SB 958 Dodd Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 41 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 958 Dodd Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 37 N: 31 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB958 Dodd (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 604, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 6126.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 41. Noes 35. Page 7052.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-30 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Aguiar-Curry. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 37. Noes 31. Page 6732.) |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 18). |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4226.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4995.) (May 9). |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | May 2 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 9500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50079 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50079.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |