CA SB957 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 16).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 5205.5 and 21655.9 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: high-occupancy vehicle lanes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB957 Lara et al (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 3.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 4384.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4300.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 4821.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-01-31SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code21655.9Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code5205.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback