CA SB956 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Assembly Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Sections 42 and 43 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Taxation: tax expenditures: California Tax Expenditure Review Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB956 Jackson (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2020-06-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 3798.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3767.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-02SenateHearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-21SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3576.) (May 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 21.
2020-05-12SenateReferral to Coms. on G.O., and ED. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
2020-02-20SenateReferred to Coms. on GOV. & F., G.O., and ED.
2020-02-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
2020-02-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code42Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code43Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback