CA SB955 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 921, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 921, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48205 of the Education Code, relating to pupil attendance.
Title
Pupil attendance: excused absences: civic or political events.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB955 Leyva Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 955 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Lee (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB955 Leyva (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 955 Leyva Senate Third Reading By Lee (Y: 56 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB955 Leyva (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 921, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 4936.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 16. Page 5947.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 15). |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 3887.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3776.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3348.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |