CA SB955 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-16 - From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 16).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 3 (commencing with Section 6600) to Division 3 of the Water Code, relating to water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oroville Dam: Citizens Advisory Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB955 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4451.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4300.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-26SenateApril 30 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-24SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-04-18SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4698.) (April 16).
2018-03-23SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2018-03-21SenateRe-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and JUD.
2018-03-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-31SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 2.
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Water Code6600New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback