CA SB955 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1026 of, and to add Sections 1370.015 and 2977 to, the Penal Code, and to add Section 4146 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
State hospital commitment: compassionate release.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB955 Beall Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 955 Beall Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB955 Beall (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Held in Committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 955 Beall Senate Third Reading By JONES-SAWYER (Y: 50 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB955 Beall (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Set, first hearing. Held in Committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 715, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5513.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 6015.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 3). |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 21). |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | June 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 4039.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4000.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | May 27 set for first hearing. Held in committee. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3612.) (April 19). |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3335.) (March 30). |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and PUB. S. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1026 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1370.015 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 2968 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 2977 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 4146 | New Code | See Bill Text |