CA SB953 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 426, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 426, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 71730) to Chapter 5 of Part 5 of, and to add Part 11.6 (commencing with Section 72770) to, Division 20 of the Water Code, relating to the Central Basin Municipal Water District.
Title
Central Basin Municipal Water District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB953 Lara Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 953 Lara Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, C (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB953 Lara (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 953 Lara Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, C (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB953 Lara (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 426, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 2. Page 5411.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5918.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 4039.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4000.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3419.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 71730 | New Code | See Bill Text |