CA SB95 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Sections 248.2 and 248.3 to the Labor Code, relating to employment, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment: COVID-19: supplemental paid sick leave.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB95 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - SB 95 Skinner Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 57 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB95 (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2021.
2021-03-19 Approved by the Governor.
2021-03-18 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
2021-03-18SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 546.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-03-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2021-03-15AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 19. Page 650.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-03-15AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2021-03-15AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2021-03-15AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 17. Page 645.)
2021-03-15AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-02-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-02-16AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 15. Page 328.)
2021-01-22AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2021-01-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-01-21SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 2. Page 91.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-01-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-01-15SenateOrdered to second reading.
2021-01-15SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 22. Noes 8. Page 76.)
2021-01-11SenateRead first time.
2020-12-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 16.
2020-12-16SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code248.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Labor Code248.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback