CA SB95 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 69614.3 and 77203 of the Government Code, relating to courts, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Courts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 95 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB95 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB95 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB95 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB95 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 36, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1602.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2309.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.) |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 669.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 69614.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 77203 | Amended Code | Citation Text |